Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 840 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18643 Week
» 71659 Month
» 191186 Year
» 3218039 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2353 |
m/e |
03/1921 |
British Railways |
32353 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
L. Billinton |
Class |
Moguls |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 03/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 30/12/1962 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1963 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1921 |
3B |
|
Three Bridges |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/12/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/09/1961 |
Eastleigh MPD (71A) (Ex-Works) |
On 5th September the following were noted out of use either waiting works or cutting up-30029/44/120/83/258/87/530/82/4/668/74/701/82/3/93, 30800/50/1/2/5/8, 31061/493/2103/3024/38/4099, 41312, 73051, 76009, 80039/40, 82014 and GW 4610. Ex-Works were 30072/494/2353/4091 an 80016 together with 3620 (81C) and 3633 with 87C plate but with S.R. brackets newly fitted to smokebox door to take GW lamps as well as SR. 92052 (18A) was also on shed. |
SLS/196110 |
11/09/1963 |
Eastleigh MPD (Waiting Works or scrap) |
Ex Works on 71A-DS238 (ex-30070 named Wainwright), 34030, 34102, 41290/5, 76007, D3719. Waiting Works or scrap on 71A-30065/89, 30199, 30241, 30346/68, 30500/3/11/5/6/9/48/86, 30911/30/6, 31403/13, 31637, 31794, 31810/20/79/80/90/8/9, 31900/3/5/6/10/6/21/3, 32353, 32417, 32557, 33011/21, 34023/35/71/4, 41312, 73054. |
SLS/196310 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2353 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Three Bridges (3B ) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32353 |
|
|
30/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32353 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|