|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/09/1949 | Hythe Branch | On 26/9 the Sandling Junction-Hythe line was worked by 0-4-4T No. 32393, painted black and fully lined out, hauling a two coach ex-Brighton 'Pull and Push' set, painted red. Engine and train were both very clean. On 30/9 a similar red train, also very clean, was in use, but the state of the engine (No. 32365) left a lot to be desired. On both occasions the trains were not worked as 'Pull and Push' trains, the engine running round at each end of the mile and a-half trip. | SLS/194911 |
30/06/1950 | General | Three I.1X locomotives have recently been transferred from Bognor to New Cross Gate, namely 2002, 2008, 2596. 'H' tanks Nos. 1158 an 1319 are being fitted for pull-and-push working. 'D.3' 32365, of air attack fame, originally Victoria, has been repaired at Ashford. Several 'B.4X' ex store were working at the end of June, in readiness for use if required on Farnborough Air Pageant Specials; for these the E.R. (G.E. Section) lent a number of Westinghouse-fitted trains as traffic was expected to be heavy. |
SLS/195008 |
31/07/1950 | General | The new class '4' 2-6-4T locomotives are coming into service from Brighton Works fairly rapidly as part of the series of 11 numbered 42096-42106. The first three have been working from Brighton to Eastbourne, Tunbridge Wells, Tonbridge and elsewhere and at the time of writing had begun to be stationed at Tunbridge Wells for London turns. 'Atlantics' have been hauling through Brighton-Bournemouth trains and have also been seen again on relief Newhaven boat expresses and through Midlands trains. Two of them joined with three 'K' Moguls and a group of 'B4x' rebuilt Brighton 4-4-O's taken from store, to work special between Waterloo and Farnborough (Hants) on July 7-8 on the occasion ot the R.A.F. Air Pageant; the specials were formed of ex-L.N.E.R. suburban rolling stock rendered redundant by the Liverpool Street-Shenfield electrification and so available at a busy week-end, though not workable by the majority of S.R. locomotives on account of being fitted only with Westinghouse brake. Hence the employment of engines retaining Westinghouse gear. The Marsh 4-4-2T, No. 32089, from Eastbourne, worked local specials between Guildford and North Camp. Cutting-up of old locomotives at Horley has ceased. 'Atlantic' 32426, St. Albans Head, returned from overhaul at Eastleigh in new lined black livery with B.R. totem during July. Although of an obsolescent class, 'D3' bogie tanks, 32365, 32390, have just received new or reconditioned boilers, cylinders, etc., and new lined external finish for further push-and-pull work. A few more Wainwright 'H' 0-4-4T are being fitted for similar motor-train working, also at Ashford. 'K' Moguls have been used a good deal on through Midlands trains along the Sussex coast; 'B4x' also 'El' rebuilt 4-4-0's have traversed the 'cuckoo' single line through Heath-field, connecting Tunbridge Wells with Eastbourne, as have the new mixed traffic tanks. |
SLS/195010 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1892 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 2365 Built at Brighton Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD) | ||
05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 32365 | ||
09/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Horsham (75D) | ||
09/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Horsham (75D) | ||
06/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
13/12/1952 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 32365 | ||
02/1953 | Scrapped | Scrapped |