Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2657 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16063 Week
» 69079 Month
» 188606 Year
» 3215459 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2379 |
m/e |
07/1893 |
British Railways |
32379 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Bogie Tanks |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 07/1893 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1952 |
Service Life |
59 yrs , 5 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1953 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1893 |
STL |
|
St Leonards |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
75D |
|
Horsham |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
75D |
|
Horsham |
5w/e |
09/10/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
12/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
75D |
Horsham |
5w/e |
09/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
15/11/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2379 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Leonards (STL) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32379 |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Horsham (75D) |
|
|
09/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Horsham (75D) |
|
|
12/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32379 |
|
|
01/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|