Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3229 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16635 Week
» 69651 Month
» 189178 Year
» 3216031 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2423 |
m/e |
09/1911 |
British Railways |
32423 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Marsh |
Class |
Atlantics |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-2 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 09/1911 |
Withdrawal |
During 05/1949 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1911 |
NHN |
|
Newhaven |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
BTN |
|
Brighton |
8w/e |
08/01/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
05/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BTN |
Brighton |
8w/e |
08/01/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
01/06/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1945 |
Ashford Works |
Although 2423 was recently painted green and lined, other 'Atlantics' have left Ashford painted black, e.g., No. 2037. |
SLS/194602 |
30/04/1947 |
Victoria Station |
S.E. & C. 4-4-O's of various classes, including Nos. 1515, 1545, and 1760 have been noted piloting 'H2' No. 2423 on Victoria-Newhaven boat trains which have not been loaded above the recent 4-4-2 capacity, but it was probably on account of the service slacks due to landslides and track repairs following the severe weather. |
SLS/194706 |
15/01/1948 |
Waterloo Station |
'H.2' No. 2423 NHN was put on an unusual job on 15/1. She hauled an electric 4-corridor unit from Waterloo to Portsmouth and back, upon which the C.E.E.'s Department were making various tests. 2423 put up quite a good performance, especially on the return trip |
SLS/194803 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2423, name: THE NEEDLES Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newhaven (NHN) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 32423 but not taken up |
|
|
08/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2423 |
|
|
06/1949 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|