Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3006 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16412 Week
» 69428 Month
» 188955 Year
» 3215808 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2499 |
m/e |
06/1900 |
British Railways |
32499 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 06/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/06/1957 |
Service Life |
57 yrs , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1957 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
7w/e |
03/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
5w/e |
31/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/06/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1947 |
Ashford Works |
Locos. entering Works during the period 4/5/47 to 31/5/47 included: 1123, 1164, 1309, 1319, 1380, 1384, 1403, 1407, 1508, 1573, 1595, 2408, 2454, 2459, 2480, 2482, 2485, 2491, 2499 and W.D. 78563. |
SLS/194708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2499 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newhaven (NHN) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32499 |
|
|
03/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
06/1957 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
01/06/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32499 |
|
|