Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 32 Online
» 4541 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18584 Week
» 83538 Month
» 286202 Year
» 3313055 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2509 |
m/e |
12/1900 |
British Railways |
32509 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 31/03/1962 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/02/1948 |
Brighton Works |
'E4' S2509 came off shops on 10/2, and SCC1 (still green) with new lettering on the following day. Three of the new lot of 'Battle of Britain' class are already in course of erection; No. 171 should be out early in March. Of the U.S.A. 0-6-OT, only No. 1264 remains in the works (Porter 7420 of 1942) which it is understood will become No. 61. Nos. 62-74 are Vulcan-built, and in Southern livery except that the last is still working as 4326 and that S64 is in the British Railways livery. Three of the seven remaining 'A.12's' in the stock list were noted at work: Nos. 627, 629, and 636 |
SLS/194803 |
30/09/1950 |
General |
Now that the new 2-6-4 tanks are arriving at Tunbridge Wells West, the Maunsell 0-6-0s of class, 'Q' which had been on the Oxted line passenger jobs have been transferred to other sheds for freight duties. Nos. 42096-42101 had arrived to the beginning of September, and a few more are expected. Others under construction in Brighton Works are 42103-42106, 42066-42069. This method of 'numbering backward' savours of L.M.S. methods, though it is understood that after reaching 42095 the next will be 82010 (but not this year!) It is not unusual to see class '5MT' from the L.M.R. at Brighton, chiefly on Sundays or in mid-week: the shedplates are usually 2A or 1A, e.g., 45020 an 45353, but 45233 with a 26A plate was something rather out of the ordinary on 27th August. Little progress has been made recently with the last of the 4-6-2 to be built at Brighton (No. 34110): precedence is doubtless being given to the class '4' tanks. Only a few 2-8-0 seem to be in traffic round Brighton nowadays, though several are in Brighton shops for heavy repair; 90247, however, is much in evidence with its 4B shedplate, a legacy from its' Shrewsbury days. Several Central Section engines have now had their 75A plates affixed, the earliest noted being 31556, 32505, 32509, 32339, 32424, but the number grows daily. Eastern section engines working in have not had shedplates up to the end of August. Early in September the last active 0-4-2T No. 2252 was regularly on the Horsham auto, leaving Brighton about 4 p.m.; it is feared that this veteran may soon wear out its boiler, and then-goodbye? |
SLS/195010 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2509 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Fratton (FRA) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32509 |
|
|
06/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
26/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
05/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
18/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
31/03/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32509 |
|
|
04/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|