Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1349 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14755 Week
» 67771 Month
» 187298 Year
» 3214151 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2587 |
m/e |
12/1903 |
British Railways |
32587 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Large Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1903 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1954 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1954 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2587 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32587 |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
10/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
11/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32587 |
|
|
11/1954 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|