Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4162 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17568 Week
» 70584 Month
» 190111 Year
» 3216964 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2605 |
m/e |
01/1874 |
British Railways |
32605 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stroudley |
Class |
D1M |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 01/1874 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1948 |
Service Life |
74 yrs , 10 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1874 |
EBN |
|
Eastbourne |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
11/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
EBN |
Eastbourne |
on |
06/11/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1947 |
Eastbourne MPD |
The following locos. were stored out in the open at the end of May at Eastbourne (some partly dismantled and others in a poor state): 'B4' 4-4-0 Nos. 2044, 2054, 2062, 2063, 2068; 'Dl' 0-4-2T Nos. 2234, 2259, 2274, 2284, 2358, 2361, 2605 and 2699. The latter has a Drummond chimney. Some of the above have traces of pre-war green paint and large numbers, while No. 2605 (although rusting), in malachite green, still shows the effects of the care bestowed on her while in Scotland during the recent war. |
SLS/194708 |
08/07/1948 |
Eastbourne MPD |
On 8/7, the following locomotives were stored here: 'B.4' 2044/54/62/63/68; 'B.4X' 2050/52/70/73; 'D.1' 2215/34/74, 2358, 2605; 'D.3X' 2397; 'L.1X' 2003/4/6/8/910, 2595-96, 2603, 32005. The 'B.4' and 'D.1' were mostly in a dilapidated condition, some of which still retain the large numerals on the tenders, etc. |
SLS/194808 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1874 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2605 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastbourne (EBN) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2605 |
|
|
12/1948 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 32605 but not taken up |
|
|