Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 483 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19394 Week
» 84348 Month
» 287012 Year
» 3313865 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
C8 |
m/e |
07/1942 |
British Railways |
33008 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
Q1 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 07/1942 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 25/08/1963 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1942 |
GFD |
|
Guildford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
FEL |
|
Feltham |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
25/08/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
FEL |
Feltham |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
25/08/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/05/1951 |
Ashford Works |
In shops: 31225/70/91/335/542/620/34/81/8/763, 31814/34/67/9,5/6, 33008/19, 90142. To be cut up: 31697, (3)1093, (3)1379, 31494, 31509, 31731, 31595, 31743, 31710. New: Diesels 15229/30. |
SLS/195107 |
28/07/1961 |
Ashford MPD (73F) (ex-works) |
On shed waiting works-31583 an 31714, ex-works-30902, 31612, 31794, 33008/22/9/30. |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1942 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number C8 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD) |
|
|
06/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (FEL) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33008 |
|
|
25/08/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33008 |
|
|
06/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|