Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 569 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4251 Week
» 10959 Month
» 163912 Year
» 1829288 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) C19 m/e 05/1942
British Railways 33019 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class Q1
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1942
Withdrawal w/e Sun 01/12/1963
Service Life 21 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1942
ELH   Eastleigh on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74B   Ramsgate 6w/e 27/03/1953
73A   Stewarts Lane 8w/e 20/07/1953
70C   Guildford 5w/e 24/08/1953
     Withdrawn w/e 01/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ELH Eastleigh 5w/e 11/08/1947
ALLOC 74B Ramsgate 3w/e 27/03/1953
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 70C Guildford 5w/e 24/08/1953
WDN   w/e 01/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/05/1951 Ashford Works In shops: 31225/70/91/335/542/620/34/81/8/763, 31814/34/67/9,5/6, 33008/19, 90142. To be cut up: 31697, (3)1093, (3)1379, 31494, 31509, 31731, 31595, 31743, 31710. New: Diesels 15229/30. SLS/195107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1942 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number C19
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 33019    
27/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
24/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
01/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 33019    
01/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev