Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 569 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4251 Week
» 10959 Month
» 163912 Year
» 1829288 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) C24 m/e 06/1942
British Railways 33024 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class Q1
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1942
Withdrawal w/e Sun 25/08/1963
Service Life 21 yrs, 2 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1964 at Cohens (Kettering)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1942
ELH   Eastleigh on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74D   Tonbridge 4w/e 29/10/1953
70B   Feltham m/e 10/02/1961
75E   Three Bridges 4w/e 24/09/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 25/08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ELH Eastleigh P 01/12/1947
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 6w/e 18/11/1953
ALLOC 70B Feltham 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 24/09/1962
WDN   w/e 25/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/11/1951 Didcot, Newbury & Southampton line There is a new through goods working from Didcot to Eastleigh, via Winchester, a G.W. 2-8-0 usually alternating with a Ql. On 6th November, 2816 came to Eastleigh and 33024 went to Didcot. SLS/195201
05/09/1961 Eastleigh MPD (71A) (out of use) On 5th September the following were noted out of use either waiting works or cutting up-30029/44/120/83/258/87/530/82/4/668/74/701/82/3/93, 30800/50/1/2/5/8, 31061/493/2103/3024/38/4099, 41312, 73051, 76009, 80039/40, 82014 and GW 4610. Ex-Works were 30072/494/2353/4091 an 80016 together with 3620 (81C) and 3633 with 87C plate but with S.R. brackets newly fitted to smokebox door to take GW lamps as well as SR. 92052 (18A) was also on shed. SLS/196110

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1942 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number C24
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 33024    
29/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
24/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
25/08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 33024    
06/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev