Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 579 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4261 Week
» 10969 Month
» 163922 Year
» 1829298 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) C25 m/e 07/1942
British Railways 33025 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class Q1
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1942
Withdrawal w/e Sun 07/07/1963
Service Life 21 yrs , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1942
ELH   Eastleigh on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70A   Nine Elms 6w/e 18/06/1954
70C   Guildford 4w/e 20/08/1954
     Withdrawn w/e 07/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ELH Eastleigh P 01/12/1947
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 22/06/1954
ALLOC 70C Guildford P 20/08/1954
WDN   w/e 07/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/03/1951 Ashford Works (In yard) In shops: 1107, 31245 (late s1245), s1274, 31287, 31329, 31413, 31510, 31812/26/62, 31900/23/25, 32372 (new cyls.), 32502 (lined black), s2473 (being renumbered), 32467, 32525/65, 78597, 90226, 33039. In yard: s1178, 1335, 31789 (green), 31897, 33025, 31616, 31848. On shed for works 1174, 31408, 31461, 32486 (and 30793 for ELH). Scrap: 1157, 31160 (partly cut up), 1547, 1730, 31743, 31502, 32402, and being cut up 1443 an 32301. Building Shunting diesel-electric 15228-30 and a main-line diesel 10203. Twenty sets of frames for 4-6-2 to be built at Crewe, also many sets of all-welded side tanks for new B.R. standard 2-6-4T to be built at Brighton. Noted not renumbered: 1041, 1271, 1339, 1379. Ex shops 32523 (1 dome), 31405, 31785 (green), 31521, and lined black 31401 an 31825 (late s1825) SLS/195108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1942 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number C25
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 33025    
18/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
20/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
07/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 33025    
02/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev