Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 530 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4212 Week
» 10920 Month
» 163873 Year
» 1829249 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) C26 m/e 07/1942
British Railways 33026 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class Q1
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1942
Withdrawal w/e Sun 26/09/1965
Service Life 23 yrs, 2 mths , 27 dys
Information Possibly renumbered 33026 in 6/50

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1942
TON   Tonbridge on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73D   Gillingham (Kent) m/e 30/11/1950
73D   Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 08/12/1950
74D   Tonbridge 6w/e 05/09/1951
70B   Feltham 4w/e 01/10/1953
75E   Three Bridges 4w/e 24/09/1962
70B   Feltham m/e 06/01/1964
70C   Guildford w/e 20/11/1964
70A   Nine Elms 4w/e 08/06/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 26/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TON Tonbridge P 01/12/1947
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 6w/e 05/09/1951
ALLOC 70B Feltham 5w/e 01/10/1953
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 24/09/1962
ALLOC 70B Feltham 4w/e 29/12/1963
ALLOC 70C Guildford 2w/e 20/11/1964
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 06/06/1965
WDN   w/e 26/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/05/1963 Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1942 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number C26
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 33026    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
05/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
24/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
20/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
26/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 33026    
12/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev