Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2088 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19891 Week
» 72907 Month
» 192434 Year
» 3219287 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
C30 |
m/e |
09/1942 |
British Railways |
33030 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
Q1 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 09/1942 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 14/06/1964 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 9 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1942 |
TON |
|
Tonbridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
70A |
|
Nine Elms |
4w/e |
28/05/1962 |
70B |
|
Feltham |
m/e |
06/01/1964 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
14/06/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
TON |
Tonbridge |
P |
01/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
4w/e |
28/05/1962 |
ALLOC |
75E |
Three Bridges |
4w/e |
19/11/1962 |
ALLOC |
70B |
Feltham |
4w/e |
29/12/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/06/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/07/1961 |
Ashford MPD (73F) (ex-works) |
On shed waiting works-31583 an 31714, ex-works-30902, 31612, 31794, 33008/22/9/30. |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1942 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number C30 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33030 |
|
|
28/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
06/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
14/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33030 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|