Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 557 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4239 Week
» 10947 Month
» 163900 Year
» 1829276 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) C34 m/e 11/1942
British Railways 33034 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class Q1
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 11/1942
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/01/1964
Service Life 21 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1942
FEL   Feltham on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
TON   Tonbridge 4w/e 01/04/1948
70C   Guildford 3w/e 26/05/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 05/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TON Tonbridge 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 70C Guildford 3w/e 26/05/1961
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/05/1948 General Early in May the Beattie 0-6-OT No. 4 withdrawn from the K.E.S.R. was standing at Headcom and some of the local Company's old rolling stock was being broken up. 'Q.1' Class Nos. C31-35 have gone to Tonbridge, whilst C36-40 are at Stewarts Lane and Guildford have received 'C' Class Nos. 1086/90, 1221/25/27/93 an 1508. SLS/194806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1942 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number C34
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Feltham (FEL)    
01/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 33034    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
05/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 33034    
07/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev