|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/05/1948 | General | Early in May the Beattie 0-6-OT No. 4 withdrawn from the K.E.S.R. was standing at Headcom and some of the local Company's old rolling stock was being broken up. 'Q.1' Class Nos. C31-35 have gone to Tonbridge, whilst C36-40 are at Stewarts Lane and Guildford have received 'C' Class Nos. 1086/90, 1221/25/27/93 an 1508. | SLS/194806 |
02/01/1951 | Ashford Works | New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. | SLS/195102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1942 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number C36 Built at Ashford Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Feltham (FEL) | ||
01/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) | ||
11/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 33036 | ||
04/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON) | ||
27/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) | ||
07/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) | ||
26/05/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Guildford (70C) | ||
28/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 33036 | ||
10/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |