30/06/1949 |
Brighton Works |
No. 36001, the first of the 'Leader' Class (0-6-6-0T) was outside the Works for the first time, in steam, on 21/6. The top casing was grey and the underframes and casings black. It is understood that this Class and also the new 'Battle of Britain' batch (34091 upwards) will normally be finished in lined black as for mixed traffic engines. The latest 2-8-0 repaired and re-numbered is No. 90718 (ex 79281). No. 2039 Hartland Point is in the repair shop, but its fate is uncertain: it is believed that the boiler is about worn out. Other engines recently shopped are Nos. 32488 (ex S2488), 90107 (ex 77007), 90678 (ex 79210), 32083 (plain black-so far), 90226 (ex 77311), 32536. 32576. |
SLS/194907 |
31/07/1949 |
Brighton Works |
At Brighton work is progressing on the second and third of the 'Leader' tanks (36002/03), following the trial runs of No. 36001 at the end of June to Lewes and Eastleigh. Work on Nos. 34091-94 is being somewhat retarded owing to the concentration on Nos. 36002/03, and in fact two of the current batch of twenty, Nos. 34095/97, are under construction at Eastleigh. |
SLS/194908 |
22/11/1949 |
Brighton Works |
On 22/11 'Leader' Class No. 36001 was still running trial trips with empty coaches, but had not yet been handed over to the Running Dept. No. 36002 was stored in the Electric Car Sheds at Brighton. Locomotives in shops on 16/11 were: Nos. 2386, 32498, 2528, 32538, 2594, 2655, 77340, 90247, 90354, 90375 (78569). 90622/69 and Diesel No. 3. Some of the W.D. locomotives carry the new numbers on the cab side, but the old number on, the buffer beam has not yet been painted out. New 'W.C.' No. 34096 Trevone left the Works fully painted on 15/11 . |
SLS/194912 |
20/03/1950 |
Brighton Works |
Locomotives in shops for repair on 20/3 included: Nos. 15203, 31744, 32030/89, 32519/45, 32659, 34081, 36001, ex-W.D. 77098, 77321/79, 77460, 78531, 78666. Under construction Nos. 34106 Lydford (almost ready), 34107-09, and two 2-6-4 tanks. |
SLS/195004 |
28/04/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
Noted 28.4.51-30066, 82, 30331, 30477/90/99, 30589 (being lined out), 30689, 30781/91/93, 30843, 30920/33/50, 2138, 32351, 32661 (lined out), 3441, 34007/25/49/55/79/99, 34103, 35003/10. Nos. 32328 an 32608 ex shops, lined, also 32094 (ex W/E 21/4/51). Waiting shops: 30305/14, 30829, 34002/6/30, 30197. Being cut up: 30446, 36001(!). Waiting cutting-up: 116, 30156/73, 441. Increased coal capacity: 32510/79 fitted at Eastleigh shed with coal rails for use on Fawley branch. An Adams Al2, withdrawn in 1946 is acting as stationary boiler and is re-numbered DS3191. The frames and cylinders of 722 are in good condition and are being retained as spares for the class. |
SLS/195106 |