Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 83 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17886 Week
» 70902 Month
» 190429 Year
» 3217282 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8178 |
m/e |
03/1942 |
British Railways |
48178 |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Works Number |
24747 |
To Service |
During 03/1942 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/11/1966 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1942 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8178 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24747 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A) |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48178 |
|
|
19/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
07/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
08/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
14/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
12/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
12/11/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48178 |
|
|
06/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|