Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1759 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15165 Week
» 68181 Month
» 187708 Year
» 3214561 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8179 |
m/e |
03/1942 |
British Railways |
48179 |
w/e |
08/04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Works Number |
24748 |
To Service |
During 03/1942 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 19/01/1964 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1942 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8179 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24748 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton Mersey (19D) |
|
|
21/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D) |
|
|
17/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
08/04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48179 |
|
|
13/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
26/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
19/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48179 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|