Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 484 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19395 Week
» 84349 Month
» 287013 Year
» 3313866 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8198 |
m/e |
06/1942 |
British Railways |
48198 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Works Number |
24777 |
To Service |
During 06/1942 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 18/09/1965 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
15B |
Kettering |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
ALLOC |
15A |
Wellingborough |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
ALLOC |
17E |
Heaton Mersey |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
ALLOC |
17A |
Derby |
6w/e |
11/07/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/09/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1942 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8198 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24777 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48198 |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kettering (15B) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
23/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (17E) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
18/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48198 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|