Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 908 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14314 Week
» 67330 Month
» 186857 Year
» 3213710 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8222 |
m/e |
09/1942 |
British Railways |
48222 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1942 |
15A |
|
Wellingborough |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
20C |
|
Royston |
4w/e |
10/09/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
04/11/1967 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20C |
Royston |
4w/e |
10/09/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/11/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/09/1967 |
Eastern Region (North) Steam Locomotive Stock |
No less than 90 steam locomotives were withdrawn in September and the total steam stock at the 1st October, 1967, was reduced to 21 as under:- 1 C1.5 4-6-0 (45208 at Low Moor). 2 Jubilees (45562 Alberta and 45593 Kolhapur at Holbeck). 1 K1 2-6-0 (62005 at Holbeck-transferred from Tyne Dock). 17 8F 2-8-0 (48055/67/70/76/84/93, 48113/69, 48222/76, 48352, 48439/73, 48537/40, 48622/64-all at Royston). The following classes are now extinct:-W.D. 2-8-0, Q6 0-8-0, B1 4-6-0, J27 0-6-0 and Stanier and Fairburn 2-cyl. 2-6-4Ts. 65882 (J27) was the last North Eastern Railway locomotive and the last of the pre-grouping companies' standard gauge locomotives to remain in service. No locomotives at all remain in the wheel classification 0-8-0, 0-6-0 and 2-6-4T. The number of tanks in British Railways stock at 1st October is 7 ! (three LMS 0-6-0Ts and one LNE J94 0-6-OST at Westhouses and three GW narrow gauge 2-6-2Ts for the Vale of Rheidol at Aberystwyth). (Ed. Since the above was compiled, 45593 has arrived at Tyseley (Birmingham) for repainting and the three LMS 0-6-0Ts and the J94 were taken out of traffic on 4th October, when an N.C.B. diesel commenced work at Williamthorpe Colliery). |
SLS/196711 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1942 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8222 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24812 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48222 |
|
|
10/09/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (20C) |
|
|
04/11/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48222 |
|
|
04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|