Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 157 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17960 Week
» 70976 Month
» 190503 Year
» 3217356 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
70584 |
m/e |
10/1941 |
British Railways |
48263 |
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
To Service |
During 10/1941 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1966 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy |
Information |
Accident near coventry Dec-1962: WD 506 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/08/1949 |
Crewe Works (Yard) |
21/8: New construction here was as follows: North Shed Nos. 41230/31/33; all have the crest (a smaller version than hitherto) on the tank sides. Nos. 41230/31 were due to go 'light' on 22/8 to Bangor and Denbigh respectively (No. 41231 had been working in and around the Birmingham area the previous week); Paint Shop Nos. 41234/35 and 41236 outside; Erecting Shop Nos. 41237 (complete), 41238 (almost complete with tanks), 41239 (frames and cylinders set up, boiler in separate bay, not yet mounted); Yard No. 41240 (frames and cylinders only). No. 48288 (ex W.D. 70403) was being repaired while W.D. Nos. 70438, 70584/99 were in the Works' yard. Locomotives in the new green livery included Nos. 45566/78/89, 45615, 46153/61. Scrap Road: On the cutting up road were Nos. 8948 an 9597, while No. 6004 was actually being cut up. Nos. 25297 an 25752 were over in the Carriage Shed marked 'Not to be cut up' |
SLS/194909 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1941 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 70584 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
17/09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48263 |
|
|
03/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
23/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
15/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
04/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (9J) |
|
|
09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48263 |
|
|
02/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|