Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 1335 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19138 Week
» 72154 Month
» 191681 Year
» 3218534 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8276 |
m/e |
07/1942 |
British Railways |
48276 |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
56D |
Mirfield |
4w/e |
23/01/1960 |
ALLOC |
56F |
Low Moor |
5w/e |
08/07/1961 |
ALLOC |
56D |
Mirfield |
3w/e |
30/09/1961 |
ALLOC |
56A |
Wakefield |
8w/e |
25/02/1967 |
ALLOC |
55D |
Royston |
4w/e |
15/07/1967 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/11/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
16/01/1966 |
Crewe South MPD (Waiting Works) |
ex Works: 44971, 46505, 48400. Waiting Works: 48276. Also on Crewe S. shed 61158 (36A). |
SLS/196602 |
09/09/1967 |
Eastern Region (North) Steam Locomotive Stock |
No less than 90 steam locomotives were withdrawn in September and the total steam stock at the 1st October, 1967, was reduced to 21 as under:- 1 C1.5 4-6-0 (45208 at Low Moor). 2 Jubilees (45562 Alberta and 45593 Kolhapur at Holbeck). 1 K1 2-6-0 (62005 at Holbeck-transferred from Tyne Dock). 17 8F 2-8-0 (48055/67/70/76/84/93, 48113/69, 48222/76, 48352, 48439/73, 48537/40, 48622/64-all at Royston). The following classes are now extinct:-W.D. 2-8-0, Q6 0-8-0, B1 4-6-0, J27 0-6-0 and Stanier and Fairburn 2-cyl. 2-6-4Ts. 65882 (J27) was the last North Eastern Railway locomotive and the last of the pre-grouping companies' standard gauge locomotives to remain in service. No locomotives at all remain in the wheel classification 0-8-0, 0-6-0 and 2-6-4T. The number of tanks in British Railways stock at 1st October is 7 ! (three LMS 0-6-0Ts and one LNE J94 0-6-OST at Westhouses and three GW narrow gauge 2-6-2Ts for the Vale of Rheidol at Aberystwyth). (Ed. Since the above was compiled, 45593 has arrived at Tyseley (Birmingham) for repainting and the three LMS 0-6-0Ts and the J94 were taken out of traffic on 4th October, when an N.C.B. diesel commenced work at Williamthorpe Colliery). |
SLS/196711 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1942 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8276 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stourton (20B) |
|
|
03/09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48276 |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) |
|
|
08/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
15/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (55D) |
|
|
04/11/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48276 |
|
|
04/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|