Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3485 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16891 Week
» 69907 Month
» 189434 Year
» 3216287 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8281 |
m/e |
08/1942 |
British Railways |
48281 |
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1968 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1942 |
15A |
|
Wellingborough |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
20C |
|
Royston |
4w/e |
10/09/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
06/09/1967 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20C |
Royston |
4w/e |
10/09/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/09/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1942 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8281 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
17/09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48281 |
|
|
10/09/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (20C) |
|
|
06/09/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48281 |
|
|
01/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|