|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/08/1963 | Crewe Works (Yard) | Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1073, D1550-58 UC (in various stages), D202/24/32/36/87, D316, 46230, 46442, 44812/96, 44936, 45070/94, 45310/40, 45421/31, 48121/64, 48766, 70018/50, 73166, 90384, 92014/56/83/105/113/133/154/167/173/191. Outside Erecting Shop: 44674, 45414/51, 48409, 82038, 12134/240. Stripped down in Yard: 92084/132/151/162. Dismantling Shed: 49448, 64791, 64907, 90095. On Scrap Road: 63808/17/65. Yard: D215/98, D338/344, 42151, 44826/909/81, 45218/305/398, 48035/133/296/751/770, 70004/21, 73025, 75000, 84012, 92100. Electric and Diesel Shop: 26057, 27002/4. Paint Shop: D1069/70/71/72, 45295, 45573, 49395, 26010, 1439 and Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D227/90, D335/79, D8007/21, 45283, 48502/618/709, 70020, 92020/40/86/123/192. On 21st July, Royal Scot 46151 was in the dismantling shed being broken-up, and 46152 was in the erecting shop having a casual. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1941 | To Service | To service as WD Number 70447 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7041 |
||
29/10/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48296 | ||
24/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northwich (9G) | ||
19/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
03/12/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D) | ||
23/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northwich (9G) | ||
17/05/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) | ||
08/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Widnes (8D) | ||
18/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) | ||
06/03/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
19/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) | ||
17/09/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48296 | ||
04/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |