Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1573 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25204 Week
» 90158 Month
» 292822 Year
» 3319675 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8512 |
m/e |
04/1944 |
British Railways |
48512 |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
During 04/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/09/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8512 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48512 |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
24/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48512 |
|
|
02/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|