|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/04/1964 | Derby Shed (On Shed) | On Shed: 45334 x Wok - Cw, D1730, D1732, 12088, 12095, D3022, D4132, D5265 ex works; On Shed: D1735 undercoat, 42161, 42181, 44042, 44134, 44243, 44909, 45002, 45186, 45253, 47320, 47447, 47461, 48199, 48208, 48391, 48490, 48541, 73139, 78057, 90136, 90078, 90357, 90529, 92022, 60876, 68079. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1944 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8541 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1947 |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Cricklewood East (14A) | ||
04/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48541 | ||
01/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mansfield (16C) | ||
09/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B) | ||
18/06/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48541 | ||
09/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |