Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1068 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18871 Week
» 71887 Month
» 191414 Year
» 3218267 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8542 |
m/e |
12/1944 |
British Railways |
48542 |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1948 |
To Service |
During 12/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 24/06/1967 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 6 mths , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8542 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1948 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Royston (20C) |
|
|
19/11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48542 |
|
|
14/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Farnley Junction (55C) |
|
|
14/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
24/06/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48542 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|