Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 543 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4225 Week
» 10933 Month
» 163886 Year
» 1829262 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8611 m/e 05/1943
British Railways 48611 w/e 05/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 05/12/1964
Service Life 21 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1943
18A   Toton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
15B   Kettering w/e 10/12/1949
15B   Kettering 5w/e 24/12/1949
2F   Woodford Halse w/e 22/06/1963
8H   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 07/11/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 05/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 18A Toton w/e 07/12/1946
ALLOC 15B Kettering w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 8E Northwich 4w/e 07/11/1964
WDN   w/e 05/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/12/1958 Derby Works (Works Yard) Paint shop-42337, 42518, 43960, 73044, 12043, D5005. D/E Erecting shop-10203, 10800, 12035, 13026/37/9, 15004, ED2, ED7, and last two of order D658 D3571/2. Test House-D3570, D5006. Erecting shop: 1 bay-42410G, 42421I, 44247G, 44276I, 44408G, 4463G, 47165I, 47464I, 48371I, 48403G, 48408G, 48637G, 48760I, 75026G, 80081I, 1 bay stripping-42378, 42381; Erecting shop: 2 bay-42516I, 44501G, 48063I, 48322I, 2 bay stripping-44009, 44400; Erecting shop: 3 bay-D5008-14 New, Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D1, 3, 4 & 5, 1Co-Co1 2300 H.P.; Works Yard-40047, 40680, 41083, 41090, 42534, 43186, 43856, 44053, 47309, 48533, 48611, 48639, 12096, D2(fr.), D3569, D5084/7. Locomotives stored-40538, 43881, 43930, 44142, 44369, 58132 an 49418. SLS/195901
16/01/1959 Derby Works (Paint shop) Paint shop-42378/81, 43940, 47451/583, 48611. Diesel shop-ED2, 10000/100/800, 12000/035/082, D3020, 13037, D8014. New work-0-6-0 shunters D3763/4; outside-ED7, D5001/2/6. Test House-D5005/7/8. Erecting shop-1 bay-42511I, 42610 G, 44167G, 44338I, 44535G, 44587G, 47000I, 47421I, 48006/217 G, 48370/533G, 75017I. Stripping-48654, 73038, 75035. Erecting shop-2 bay-40035I, 42533G, 42542I, 44277I, 48267I, 53808I, 48317 stripping. Erecting shop-3 bay-7 Bo-Bos (D5009-15new) 1160 H.P., 5 1-Co-Co-ls 2300 H.P. Yard-40047/680/3180/7309, 58209. SLS/195902
08/10/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D122-6, 42604/68, 44729/59, 44928, 45210/61, 45594, 45635/98, 46427, 49395 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D127, 42447, 42655, 44733, 45077, 45316, 45699, 46225, 78017, 92133. New Electing Shop: D8, D128/9/35-7, D327, D5016/74. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5, D227, D329. Erecting Shop: D130-4, D224, 41209/39, 42050/62, 42289/99, 42465, 42607, 44666/93, 44774, 44836/90, 44934/90, 45003/67, 45102/5/8, 45204/52/62/3, 45332/40, 45454, 45549/50, 45688/90, 46114/43, 46234, 46426, 48036/46/74/85, 48283, 48494, 48611/53, 48712, 49025/70, 49381, 70052, 71000, 90216/42/71, 90486, 92013/81/94, 92150. Outside Erecting Shop: D216, 42446, 42656, 45131, 45505, 45634/83, 48717, 78043, 92123. Minor Repair Road: 45646, 48451. Works Sidings: 41279, 42425, 42574, 44708/17/20/36/7/71, 44864/71, 45154, 45571/96, 45656, 46105/7/38/60, 46406, 48088, 48217, 48477, 48624/36, 49126, 90529/61. Scrap Yard: 40075/7/97, 40118, 42506, 43325, 47421/38/62, 47634, 52389 intact. Works Shunters: D3175, 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 47608, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196111
15/10/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D124-8, 42667/8, 44679/82/3, 44729/30, 45131, 45210, 45594, 45698, 46108/60, 49395, 78043. Outside Paint Shop: D123, 41209, 42425, 42656, 44696, 44774, 44893/4, 44988, 45108, 45262, 45635/56, 48085, 48283, 48477, 48717, 49025, 49125, 70052, 71000, 92081. Works Sidings: 42619/65, 44845, 45041, 45204/85, 45549, 46425, 47448, 48660, 49070, 49381, 90218, 92024/67. Erecting Shop: D8, D129-34, 41209/79, 42050, 42289/99, 42436/65, 42607/31, 44666/93/5, 44708/17/37, 44864/76/90, 44934/90, 45038/67, 45105, 45207/52/95, 45332, 45420, 45505/50/71/3, 45688/90, 45740. 46105/7, 48036/46/74, 48217, 48365, 48451, 48611/24/36/53, 48712, 49423, 90121, 90216/42/71, 90486, 90561, 92119/50. Outside Erecting Shop: D5141, 42062, 45003, 45102, 45263, 45340, 45454, 45646, 46113/43, 46234, 46426, 48494, 92013. New Erecting Shop: D135-7, D227, D327, D5016. Outside New Erecting Shop: D329. Scrap Yard-intact: 40075/7/97, 47421/38/62, 47634 intact. Scrap Yard-just cut up: 40118, 42506, 43325, 43863, 52389. Works Shunters: 43957, 44127, 44374, 47592, 51446, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441/59, D3763. SLS/196111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8611
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A)    
05/03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48611    
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Kettering (15B)    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Kettering (15B)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
07/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
05/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 48611    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev