Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 42 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 860 Week
» 17811 Month
» 170764 Year
» 1836140 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8612 m/e 07/1943
British Railways 48612 w/e 24/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/06/1968
Service Life 24 yrs, 11 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1943
1A   Willesden on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
21A   Saltley 3w/e 11/12/1948
20A   Holbeck (MR) w/e 20/08/1949
9D   Newton Heath w/e 27/06/1964
9F   Heaton Mersey w/e 12/03/1966
9D   Newton Heath w/e 17/12/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 29/06/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 21A Saltley w/e 18/12/1948
LOAN 68A   w/e 19/03/1949
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 20/08/1949
LOAN 68A   w/e 20/08/1949
ALLOC 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 06/08/1955
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 5w/e 12/03/1966
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 4w/e 31/12/1966
WDN 9D Newton Heath w/e 29/06/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/11/1964 Crewe Works (Side of Works) Erecting shop: D1641-1662; D214, D224, D236, D257, D351, D395/7, D5700/14, D6833/49, D8014/26/35/59, 42581, 42665, 44689, 44710/74, 45215/79, 46484, 48056, 48190, 48301, 48533/56, 48719/40, 92008/74/9/87/8; Near Chester line: 44715, 44844, 44988, 45000, 45660, 46402, 92019; Side of Works: 42089, 42218, 42569, 44658, 44778, 44838, 44989, 45035, 45303, 45412, 45562, 46501, 48168, 48612, 92004/64, 92117/67. Paint shop area: D251, D297, D305, D329, D336, D369, D1633/4/5/7/8/9/40, D5716, D6889, D8058, 42233, 48046/50, 70002/11/34, 92233; Cutting up: 42221, 42559; New Erecting shop: D338, E3002/4, 26025; Inspection road: 44667, 45031, 48206/52, 92139/57; Misc.: 42267/97, 44730, 45089, 45130, 48153/92, 48212/67, 48345/65, 48455, 48529, 48677/85, 48764, 70015/18/37, 80072, 92206, D219, D293, D6774, D8001/36, 26049. SLS/196412
24/01/1965 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: D1661-71, D1672-7 bodies, D225, D267, D299, D335, D1502/10/21/35/68/9, D1604/7, D1724/44, D5710, D6854, D8048, 42141/252/468/699, 44682/773/841/965, 48163/8/204/327/612/77/97/739, 70008/15/23/42/5, 92015/93/167/9. Outside: D1653/60, D1515, D1701, D229, 44684, 48315/751, 92002. Side of Works: 44691/717, 45300, 70022/35, 48035/322/423. Paint shop: E3704, 71000 stored, D236, D347, D1655/6/9, D5714. Outside: D1654/7/8, D1756, D5700, D6853, D8060, E3018, 45193, 48212, 78041, 92047/132/9. Traverser area: 44778, D233, D382, D1511/30, D1688, D5703, D7594, D8036/42/61. SLS/196503

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8612
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A)    
24/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48612    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
20/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
27/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
12/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
17/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
29/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 48612    
11/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev