Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 32 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 850 Week
» 17801 Month
» 170754 Year
» 1836130 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8619 m/e 10/1943
British Railways 48619 w/e 28/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 26/03/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
15C   Leicester Midland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
15A   Wellingborough w/e 11/03/1950
15C   Leicester Midland 4w/e 16/05/1953
15D   Coalville w/e 21/02/1959
16G   Westhouses w/e 30/10/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 26/03/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough w/e 11/03/1950
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 15D Coalville 4w/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 16G Westhouses 4w/e 06/11/1965
WDN   w/e 26/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/01/1961 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop, ED2/4/6, D2508, D2902, D5086, D5705/11, D8008, 10800, 11117, 12058/89, 13126/171/5. Test House: D18, D229, D3368/568, D5146/7, D8001. New Building: D21-D28, D5085. Finishing Shop: D17, D20, D3022, D5134/49. Erecting Shop: 41537, 42067/91, 42254/388/511/8, 43969/77, 44182/209/540/51, 44843, 47164/231, 48132/41/223/61/315/83/495/766, 92091. Paint Shop: D19, M1000, 42071, 47359/92, 48007. In Works Sidings: 40028, 42076, 42300/97/439/530/9, 43194, 43572/4/954, 44167/268, 47212/347/401, 48386, 48619/89, 58850, 73045, 92129. SLS/196102
12/03/1963 Derby Works (Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay) D42, D78, D82, D99, D107, D117/9, D120/1, D5027/88, D5393. Outside: D5002/18, D5189. Test House: D48, D113/8, D3372, D5136/87/8/91/2/3. Diesel Finishing Shop: D70, D5010, D5194/5/6. Paint Shop: D5190. Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 43637, 44393, 48619, 73045, 75061, D8, D2913, D3020, D5012, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay: D54, D109, D5083/4; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay: D5197-D5210 new. Works yard: 40026, 42392/422/72/500, 42784, 44004/112, 44228 frames, 44519, 47003, 47276, 58138, 73159, u60093, D64, D94, D111, D130, D5005/31. Stored outside Works offices: 10000/201/2/3. SLS/196304
30/04/1963 Oswestry Works (Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay) Oswestry Works in April contained ex GSWR 0-6-0T ex Hafod Colliery (NBL 21621 of 1917). SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8619
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Leicester Midland (15C)    
28/01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 48619    
11/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Coalville (15D)    
30/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (16G)    
26/03/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 48619    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev