Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 36 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2834 Week
» 14516 Month
» 167469 Year
» 1832845 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8620 m/e 11/1943
British Railways 48620 w/e 25/02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 11/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/06/1968
Service Life 24 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1943
18B   Westhouses on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
18A   Toton 4w/e 04/10/1958
18B   Westhouses w/e 23/06/1962
16B   Colwick w/e 22/10/1966
9D   Newton Heath w/e 12/11/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 29/06/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 18B Westhouses 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 5w/e 12/11/1966
WDN 9D Newton Heath w/e 29/06/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/02/1964 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Scrap Yard: 40147, 42313, 44096, 44216. Traction Shop: D202, D374, D8006, D8054, E3007, 27000. Outside Traction Shop: D201, D272, D1561 painted, D1591, D1592, D1593, D1594 shell only, D6756, D6843, D8050, 92031. Outside Erecting Shop: D300, 42202, 44816, 45140, 45200, 48186, 48268, 92118, 92177. Erecting Shop: D222, D235, D238, D242, D271, D292, D332, D382, D384, D1570 undercoat, D1571 undercoat, D1572 motors mounted, D1573 motors mounted, D1574 motors mounted, D1575 motors mounted, D1576 motors mounted, D1577, D1578, D1579, D1580, D1581, D1582, D1583, D1584, D1585, D1586, D1587, D1588, D1589, D1590 shell only, D5717 (which is the first of the class seen at this works), D6731, D6766, D6848, D6856, D6878, D8010, D8014, D8022, 41272, 42066, 42074, 44762, 44843, 45045, 45109, 45264, 45289, 45368, 48399, 48409, 48495, 48620, 48688, 70001, 70038, 78020, 92099, 92161. Works Yard: D203, D350, 42229, 42463, 44012, 44760, 44831, 44837, 44852, 44918, 45032, 45069, 45075, 45128, 45278, 45464, 45495, 45569, 46490, 46492, 48154, 48394, 48452, 48637, 48668, 48734, 48736, 48753, 73137, 84008, 92129, 92155, 92188. Outside Paint Shop: D246, D250, D327, D369, D1556 painted, D1557 painted, D1558 painted, D1559 painted, D1562 painted. Paint Shop: D1073, D1560, D1563, D1564, D1565, D1566, D1567, D1568, D1569. SLS/196403
08/05/1966 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: 45025/39/145/198, 45375, 48620, 75016, 92009/110/60, D1100-7, D1557/60, D1709/11/21/2/42/7/52, D203, D253/4, D279, D317/21/5/41, E5016; Paint shop: 45294, 45455, 70010/22, 46235, 71000 stored, D1635, D1996/8/9, D5232, D5709; Electric and adjacent shop: D221, D257, D276, D1507/12, D1844/8, D5196, D5223/9/33, D5243, D7582, E3031/7/42/67, 26021; Old cutting up shop: E3045, D1534/75, D1889, D5704, D8045; Side of Works: 45395, 92048/163, D5702/10; Traverser area: D310/20/37/55/79, D1515/90, D1603/6, D1708/14/8, D1897, D1997, 26048, 92052. SLS/196606

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1943 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8620
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Westhouses (18B)    
25/02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 48620    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (18B)    
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (16B)    
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
29/06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 48620    
11/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev