29/08/1958 |
Derby Works (Erecting shop-2 bay) |
29th August. Paint shop- 40010 G, 42369 G, 43948 I, 44147 I, 47635 I, 75039 G, D3542/3 new, D5001 new; Diesel shop- 10203, 15000 I, 15004 Casual, D3544-D3554 (order no. 658); Erecting shop-1 bay, 40038 G, 42420 I, 42526 G, 44035 I, 44519 G, 44577 G, 47236 G, 47574 G, 47597 G, 48410 I, 75017 I, 75030/3 G, 80137 I, 80138 G, also 53803, 75032, 80061; Erecting shop-2 bay, 43621 G, 44045 I, 44241 G, 44371 G, 47230 G, 48642 G, 48672 G, 53805 I, also 44046 an 48461; Erecting shop-3 bay, 10 Bo-Bos (D5002-11, three engines in), 3 1-Co-Co-ls (D1-3, no engines in). Yard- 40047, 40680, 41078, 41156, 42508, 43631, 43918, 47309, 48176, 75013 an 12098. Test House- D5000 an 10800. |
SLS/195809 |
17/09/1958 |
Derby Works (Erecting shop-no. 2 bay) |
17th September. Paint shop- 42420 I, 80061 G, D3546/7 new, D5002 new; Test House-D8000; Diesel shop- 10203, 12089, 13056, 15004, D3548-56/8 (new work order no. D658); Erecting shop-no. 1 bay- 40038 G, 42333 I, 42526 G, 43225 I, 44564 G, 47366 G, 48008 G, 48176 I, 48212 G, 48393 I, 73093 I, 75032 G, 75033 G, 80139 I, stripping-42404, 43760, 73040 G, Erecting shop-no. 2 bay- D3557 new, 42525 G, 44100 G, 44137 I, 47666 I, 48060 I, 48461 I, 48672 G, stripping-42305, 44200, 47308, 58115; Works yard- 40005, 40047, 40680, 42508, 43815, 44602, 47309, 48378/87, 75043, 80043, 15000, D3542, D8013. |
SLS/195810 |
17/09/1959 |
Derby Works (Yard) |
Paint shop-44389/529/8346, D4, D3785, D5023; Diesel Erecting Shop-10201, 11126, 12038, 13091, New Work-9 D/E Sh. D3787-95new; Diesel Finishing Shop-D2/3/5, D5025; Test House-D5024; Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay-42281 I, 42512 I, 42514 G, 42517 I. 42624 G. 44267 G, 44355 I, 44539 G, 47386 I, 47413 G, 47681 G, 48274/552 I, 48600 G, 48715 G, 80091 G. Stripping-44201, 47598, 48108/218stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay-42337/53 I, 43982 I. 44214/472 Casual, 80040 I; Stripping-47315stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 3 Bay-9 1160 H.P. Bo-Bo D5026-34new etc., 5 2300 H.P. 1-Co-Co-1 D6-10new; Yard-40047, 40332/680, 42257/314/54/422, 42537 frames, 42686, 43886/935, 44122/69/87/327/77/402/560, 44807, 47309, 48177/293/672/87, 58191, 75046, 10100/800, 12000/36/55, D3786, ED4, Cecil Raikes. |
SLS/195910 |
07/05/1961 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: D100-2, 41254/65/73, 41325, 44872, 90173 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D103/5, 44837/43, 45565, 49395, 90582. Works Sidings: 41222, 42114, 42283, 42569, 43200, 43605, 44731/64, 44906, 45150, 45226/53, 45417, 45507/84, 46130, 46227/45, 46410/43, 47513, 47625, 48262, 48435, 48603, 48895, 49431, 70050, 78021, 90033, 92107. Erecting Shop: D110-6, 41246/64, 42110/54/60/86, 42285, 42557, 42618, 44750/62, 44834/9/91, 44932, 45078, 45142/82, 45238/74, 45300/97, 45441, 45514/21/45, 45613/28/44/64/95, 45701/2/10/36, 46127/50/7/70, 46246/7, 46487, 46501, 48171, 48317/54, 48430/74, 48511, 48672, 49094, 78031/62, 90214/99, 90315, 90530, 90712, 92020/49. Outside Erecting Shop: 42584, 44937, 45014, 45681, 48418/31/44, 90555, 92124. New Erecting Shop: D106-9/17-9. Scrap Road: 40204, 40589, 43515, 43729, 43948, 44072, 44357, 44480, 47626/37, 58221, with 47190 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 43957, 44363, 44552, 47592, 51412, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. |
SLS/196106 |
27/11/1966 |
Locations of stored steam locomotives (Colwick) |
Toton-27/11/66 78061/4. Stored Colwick-44811/47/941/84, 45224/89/464, 48073/83/127/37/43/77/90/361/76/88/414/32/538/635/45/51/62/72/90. No steam at Colwick since 5/12/66. |
SLS/196701 |
31/12/1966 |
Colwick MPD (Stored) |
Stored 44847/941/84, 45224/89, 48083/143/361/70/88/651/62/72. Also on shed Dept.29 in steam. |
SLS/196702 |