Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 566 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4248 Week
» 10956 Month
» 163909 Year
» 1829285 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8673 m/e 05/1944
British Railways 48673 w/e 13/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/11/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1944
4B   Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25A   Wakefield w/e 27/03/1948
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 10/12/1949
8B   Warrington Dallam 4w/e 27/02/1954
18A   Toton 4w/e 19/05/1956
16B   Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 17/05/1958
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 14/01/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 04/11/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 28/02/1948
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 27/03/1948
LOAN 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 29/10/1949
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 20/02/1954
LOAN 18A Toton 4w/e 19/05/1956
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 01/02/1967
WDN 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 04/11/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/10/1945 Swansea Paxton Street MPD Home engines on shed on 17/10 were: 1676, 2360/81/90, 7715/41, 7807, 7931/3/41, 8325/44/5, 8673/89/91, 9033, 9260, 9358, 27621, 28543, 28622. Other locos were 2307, 5245, 5318, 8324, 8688, 9019 of 4A and 7258 of 4C. SLS/194601
13/05/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, no. 1 bay) Paint shop-44467G, 44603 G, 48186 I, 48405 G, 73030 I, 73032 G, 12092, D3767/8 New; Diesel Erecting shop-10202, 12053, ED4/5, D3085, D3491, D5702; New Work-8 d/e shunters 0-6-0 (D3769-76). Test House-D5015/6/7, D3124; Diesel Finishing Shop-D5018, D1 Scafell Pike, D2 Helvellyn; Erecting Shop, no. 1 bay-42375I, 42505 I, 42641 I, 44036 G, 44092 G, 44097 G, 44195 I, 44206 I, 44213 G, 44387 G, 44582 G, 47255 G, 47378 I, 47442 G, 48088 I, 48374 G, 48636 G, 48673 I, 73136 I, 75005 I; Erecting Shop, no. 1 bay - stripping-52532, 43982, 44049, 44211. Erecting Shop, no. 2 bay-41000 (Boiler RBS 5240 no, 12594, type G9 ex 40928; present state-6 frame inserts, boiler in, motion and slide bars in partly, driving splashers and footplate supports fitted), 42508 I, 42531 I, 44188 I, 44414 I, 47414 I, 73132 I; Erecting Shop, no. 2 bay - stripping-73144; Erecting Shop, no. 3 bay-4 2300 H.P. 1-Co-Co-1 (D3-6), 6 1160 H.P. Bo-Bo (D5019-24); Yard-40047, 40680, 43205/54, 42541, 42661, 44588, 45032, 47309, 48111, 48385, 48643, 53806, 58281, 10100, 10800, Cecil Raikes. Stored locos. moved into Wks. yard-40931, 41068, 41119/63/4/7/93, 43231/301/441/522/745 an 43815. Stored locos, by side of Test House-40412/536, 41062, 41857 an 47214. SLS/195906
13/04/1960 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop: 42500 G, 75053 I, D3952/3 New, D5114 New, D5713 Casual. Diesel Erecting Shop:-10001 G, 12045/70/6/99, 13118, D2901/8, D8004, 4 D.E. Sh. 0-6-0. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay:-42099 G, 42219/389/406/520 G, 42556 I, 47578 G, 48027/64/673 I, 48696 G 48704 G, 75012/19 I. No. 1 Bay Stripping:- 42213/311, 44289. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay:- 44270 Casual, 9 0-6-0 D.E. Sh. No. 2 Bay Stripping:- 44133, 48403, 73004. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay:- D5003 Casual 3 1.Co-Co.1 2300 H.P. D.E., 8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D.E. (D5118 etc.) Test House:- 10202, D2220, D3955/7, D5117, D8012. Diesel Finishing Shop:- D214, D5014 Casual, D5115/6. Yard:- 40070, 40633, 42211, 42301/20/8/31/2/53/62/417/48, 43314, 43637, 44209/406/515, 47326/96, 47400 Frames, 48100/661, 75036/54, M.R. 1000 Cecil Raikes, D10, D3015, D5716/18, ED6, 10100, 10800. SLS/196005
09/07/1962 Derby Works (Shop Road) Diesel Erecting Shop: E3071 (arrived at Derby on June 20th for testing purposes), ED3, D37, D62, D79, D104, D117/8, D176, D3018, D5009/27, D5135. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: D3291. Test House: D46, D97, D173/5, D308, D5019. Shunter Test House: D3125. New Building: D180-D189. Finishing Shop: D63, D92, D177/8, D287. Erecting Shop: ED1, D3177, 13121, 41533, 42095, 42240/7, 44049, 44214, 44362, 47532, 48607, 73066/70, 73131/7/8, 75038/63. Paint Shop: D174, MR1000. 'Stone Pit': 44583, 48167, 48704. 'Foundry Row': 44030, 44158. 'Klondyke Sidings' : D38, D50, D5017, 10201/3, plus frames of an unidentified diesel shunter (d12000?). Shop Road: 48673. 'Bone Yard': 42146/84 (both stored). SLS/196208
10/08/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D48, D104, D132, D179, D5000/80, 10001. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D5, D178, D3125, D5017. Test House: D90, D122, D176, D5018, Pullman Coach No. uM60090. Shunter Test House: D3121. New Building: D183-D192. Finishing Shop: D68, D108, D180-D182, D5022. Erecting Shop: D2386, D3117/77, 12054, 42240/7, 42335, 42413, 44321, 44575, 48000, 48132, 48673, 48759, 73161/5. Paint Shop: D177, MR1000. Outside Paint Shop: 43994. 'Stone Pit': 73159, 75063. 'Foundry Row': 42069, 42500, 43216, 43682, 44122, 73131. 'Klondyke Sidings' : D58, D87, D96, D5014/28, D5134, 10201/3, 73137 (frames only). SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1944 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8673
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (4B)    
27/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
13/08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48673    
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
27/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
19/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B)    
14/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
04/11/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 48673    
03/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev