Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 545 Today
» 681 Yesterday
» 4227 Week
» 10935 Month
» 163888 Year
» 1829264 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 8674 m/e 03/1944
British Railways 48674 w/e 31/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/12/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1944
4A   Shrewsbury on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
3A   Bescot w/e 05/08/1950
1A   Willesden 4w/e 21/02/1953
3A   Bescot 4w/e 21/03/1953
2B   Oxley w/e 26/03/1966
8C   Speke Junction w/e 04/02/1967
     Withdrawn w/e 23/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 3A Bescot w/e 05/08/1950
LOAN 1A Willesden 4w/e 21/02/1953
EXLOAN 3A Bescot 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 2B Oxley 4w/e 09/04/1966
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 01/02/1967
WDN 8C Speke Junction w/e 23/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/10/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop; No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42512 (I), 42624 (G), 47598 (G), 48001 (I), 48218 (G), 48293 (I), D3791 New, D5025 New. Diesel Erecting Shop: 10203, 11126, 12036, 13038. New Work: 9 D-E. Sh. D3792-D3800new. Test House: D6, D3789/90. Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026/7/8, D4. Erecting Shop; No. 1 Bay; 42314 (G), 42403 (I), 42405 (I), 42422 (G), 42506 (I), 42523 (I), 42537 (G), 43914 (I), 44333 (I), 44435 (I), 44521 (I), 44557 (G), 47410 (G), 48004 (G), 73030 (I), 80093 (G). Stripping: 42311, 43865, 48674stripping. Erecting Shop; No. 2 Bay: 42227 (I), 42540 (G), 43949 (G), 44262 (G), 44267 casual, 44394 (G), 48331 (I), 75044 (I). Erecting Shop; No. 3 Bay: 9 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. D-E. D5029-37uc 5 1-Co-Co-1. 2300 H.P. D-E D7-11uc. Yard: 40047, 40412, 40513/36/50/680, 42303/13/41/54, 43292/308/587/826 860/86, 44214/402, 47309/433/584/632, 48050, 58065, 73159, 10000/800, 12094, D2/5, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195911
31/12/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D9, D50, D134-7, 42600/9, 44755/81, 44942, 45092, 45680, 46224, 49395, 78035 and the usual preserved locos. Out-side Paint Shop: D5031, 42117, 42639, 45421. 45690, 48205, 70043/9. Erecting Shop: D51-60, D235, D5137, 41200, 42234/67/83/92, 42437, 42606, 44680/4, 44739/49/53, 44806, 44985, 45034, 45147, 45233, 45369/83/95, 45568/9, 45625/39/60/84, 46166, 46230/44, 46485, 48080, 48111/34, 48304, 48429/53, 48518, 48601/74, 48733, 49141. 70031, 78036, 84001, 92025/93, 92167. Outside Erecting Shop: 42073, 45283, 45560, 46152, 70022, 90702. New Erecting Shop: D1/5, D229/31/6, D328, D5073, D5136. Works Sidings: 41262, 42460, 44686, 44756, 45140/5, 45215/27/79/98, 45645. 46109/21/7/50, 46236, 48172, 48416, 48649, 48930/50. 49246, 49313, 70026/42, 78037, 90147, 90413, 92018, 92159. Scrap Road: 47467, 47420, 47570 being cut up, 40074, 42220. 44088, 44249, 45544, 47755, 47405. 50850 intact. Works Shunters: D3584, 43957, 44374, 47618/61/77, 51412/46, 52093. SLS/196202

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8674
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A)    
31/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 48674    
05/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
26/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (2B)    
04/02/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
23/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 48674    
04/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev