|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/02/1962 | Derby Works (Erecting Shop) | Roundhouse: M.R.118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. Erecting Shop: 13117, 13292, 42078, 42322/35/84, 42400/9, 43295, 44112/76, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 47461/99, 47543/65, 47631, 48149, 48355/67, 48678, 75019/46/8. New Paint Shop: D154/5, M.R.1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650. Diesel Finishing Shop: D72/9, D111/56/7. New Erecting Shop: D158-67. Works Sidings: D10/84, D128, D5142, ED1, 12000, 42306/30, 43679, 44165, 44241, 47003, 47516, 47678, 58214, 75035. Gasworks Siding: Nil. Diesel Test House: D5016. Outside Diesel Test House: D123, D2198, D2221. Diesel Shunter Test House: Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2, D122, D2213/20, D2395, D2904, D5018/9/75/7, 11155. Works Shunter: 47325. Shed road: 41168, 42328/63/8/95, 42404/48, 47218. E | SLS/196203 |
25/02/1962 | Derby MPD | Ex-Works on Shed: D155/6, D3174, D3292, 42306/22/35, 42400, 44165/79, 44241, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 4/375, 47461/99, 47543/65, 48367, 48678. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1944 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8678 Built at Brighton Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Wellingborough (15A) | ||
07/05/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48678 | ||
21/07/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
29/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) | ||
23/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) | ||
13/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (16D) | ||
25/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westhouses (16G) | ||
02/05/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Burton (16F) | ||
13/03/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E) | ||
12/02/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westhouses (16G) | ||
22/10/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (16B) | ||
12/11/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) | ||
09/12/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) | ||
29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48678 | ||
11/1968 | Scrapped | Scrapped |