Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 462 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14505 Week
» 79459 Month
» 282123 Year
» 3308976 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7659 |
m/e |
07/1944 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3108 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) |
3508 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8713 |
m/e |
12/1947 |
British Railways |
48713 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 07/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 05/03/1966 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 8 mths , 3 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 7659 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3108 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3508 |
|
|
12/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8713 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G) |
|
|
01/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48713 |
|
|
22/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
19/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G) |
|
|
25/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (27B) |
|
|
24/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
28/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
13/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E) |
|
|
05/03/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48713 |
|
|
07/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|