Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 66 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17869 Week
» 70885 Month
» 190412 Year
» 3217265 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7660 |
m/e |
07/1944 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3109 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) |
3509 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8714 |
m/e |
11/1947 |
British Railways |
48714 |
w/e |
09/07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
Works Number |
933 |
To Service |
During 07/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 04/11/1967 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 4 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 7660 Built at Brighton Works, Works Number 933 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3109 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3509 |
|
|
11/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8714 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) |
|
|
09/07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48714 |
|
|
19/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G) |
|
|
21/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
21/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Belle Vue (26G) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Belle Vue (26G) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
22/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
11/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (9J) |
|
|
22/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (9H) |
|
|
04/11/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48714 |
|
|
05/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|