Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1845 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19648 Week
» 72664 Month
» 192191 Year
» 3219044 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3781 |
m/e |
10/1903 |
British Railways |
43781 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Deeley |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 10/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 26/11/1955 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 1 mth , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sun 04/12/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1903 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3781 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hellifield (20G) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourton (20B) |
|
|
18/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourton (20B) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43781 |
|
|
09/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
26/11/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43781 |
|
|
04/12/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|