Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2040 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19843 Week
» 72859 Month
» 192386 Year
» 3219239 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3784 |
m/e |
12/1903 |
British Railways |
43784 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Deeley |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 12/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 17/09/1960 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 9 mths , 18 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1903 |
20F |
|
Skipton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
20E |
|
Manningham |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/09/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20E |
Manningham |
4w/e |
20/03/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
12/09/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1903 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3784 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Skipton (20F) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43784 |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (20E) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43784 |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|