Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1695 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19498 Week
» 72514 Month
» 192041 Year
» 3218894 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3785 |
m/e |
02/1904 |
British Railways |
43785 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Deeley |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 02/1904 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 21/11/1959 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1904 |
15D |
|
Bedford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
14C |
|
St Albans |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
15D |
|
Bedford |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/11/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
4w/e |
20/02/1954 |
ALLOC |
15D |
Bedford |
4w/e |
20/03/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1904 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3785 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bedford (15D) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43785 |
|
|
27/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Albans (14C) |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bedford (15D) |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43785 |
|
|
06/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|