Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1559 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19362 Week
» 72378 Month
» 191905 Year
» 3218758 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3298 |
y/e |
1891 |
British Railways |
43298 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During y/e 1891 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 26/11/1955 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 24/12/1955 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1891 |
18D |
|
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/11/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
26/11/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
24/06/1950 |
Derby Works |
Engines into works: 21, 40556, 40671, 40925, 41016, 41052, 41070, 41086, 41096, 41900, 42311, 42503, 43267, 3298, 3399, 43800, 3900, 3961, 3985, 44122, 44174, 58075, 58189: |
SLS/195008 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1891 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3298 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43298 |
|
|
26/11/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43298 |
|
|
24/12/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|