Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 851 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18654 Week
» 71670 Month
» 191197 Year
» 3218050 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3462 |
y/e |
1894 |
British Railways |
43462 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During y/e 1894 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 07/04/1956 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 4 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Sat 05/05/1956 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1894 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3462 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Templecombe (S&D) (22D) |
|
|
29/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43462 |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bromsgrove (21C) |
|
|
07/04/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43462 |
|
|
05/05/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|