Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 435 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14478 Week
» 79432 Month
» 282096 Year
» 3308949 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3474 |
y/e |
1896 |
British Railways |
43474 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Johnson |
Class |
3F |
Company History |
MR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During y/e 1896 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 18/03/1961 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Mon 05/11/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
y/e |
1896 |
15D |
|
Bedford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
18/03/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/03/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1962 |
Bedford MPD (Withdrawn) |
With closing of Northampton branch this shed has only one steam passenger turn (8.21 a.m. to Kettering); its only Class 5 (45238) is rostered to the pick-up goods to Northampton and back and then stand-by engine on shed. Withdrawn engines still here are 40020/53 an 43474. |
SLS/196204 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
1896 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3474 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bedford (15D) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43474 |
|
|
18/03/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43474 |
|
|
05/11/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|