Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 710 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14116 Week
» 67132 Month
» 186659 Year
» 3213512 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
271 |
m/e |
06/1900 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
B1 |
Company History |
BaR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Sharp Stewart |
To Service |
During 06/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 06/04/1951 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1900 |
CV.BRY |
|
Barry |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
06/04/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/04/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1948 |
General |
Further locomotives noted carrying the prefix 'W' with blank tanks or tender sides were:-Nos. 33, 216/63, 393, 1141, 1993, 2048, 5388, 5625, 6703, 7751/68, while those lettered 'British Railways' were:-Nos. 361, 3103, 4217, 4533, 5035/99, 5257, 5520, 5641/52/55 an 6964. Nos. 271, 4206 an 5958 had been prefixed, but still carried 'G.W.R.' |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 271 Built at Sharp Stewart |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barry (CV.BRY) |
|
|
06/04/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 271 |
|
|