Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 429 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19340 Week
» 84294 Month
» 286958 Year
» 3313811 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
844 |
m/e |
10/1918 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
15 |
Company History |
CambR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
To Service |
During 10/1918 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/08/1954 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 10 mths , 29 dys |
Total Mileage |
753,885 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1918 |
OSY |
|
Oswestry |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
89B |
|
Brecon |
4w/e |
24/01/1953 |
89A |
|
Oswestry |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/08/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
89B |
Brecon |
4w/e |
24/01/1953 |
ALLOC |
89A |
Oswestry |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
ALLOC |
89A |
Oswestry |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/08/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/05/1947 |
Oswestry MPD |
0-6-0's Nos. 844, 849, 855, 884 and 887 were on the shed on 18/5; of these No. 849 had been repainted and was just ex. Stafford Road Works, but it was understood that No. 898 was due for withdrawal. 2-4-0T. No. 1308 was in the shed whilst No. 1196 was on the 'dead' road. 0-6-0ST. No. 680 was in the shops and No. 1331 was in the shed. |
SLS/194708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1918 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 844 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oswestry (OSY) |
|
|
24/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brecon (89B) |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oswestry (89A) |
|
|
28/08/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 844 |
|
|
09/10/1954 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|