Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1453 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14859 Week
» 67875 Month
» 187402 Year
» 3214255 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1303 |
m/e |
11/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4303 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) |
2123 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
62123 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
D3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
204 |
Works Number |
747 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1897 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1949 off Colwick (CLK) |
Service Life |
52 yrs , 30 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1897 |
CLK |
|
Colwick |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
12/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
w/e |
01/11/1947 |
WDN |
CLK |
Colwick |
on |
05/12/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/08/1947 |
Doncaster Works |
On 17/8 the following withdrawn locos. (still complete) were in the Works yard: 'D3' 2127/42/47; 'D2' 2171/86/91/96; 'Cl' 2800/12; '03' 3490/92; 'J3' 4155; 'C12' 7396 and Railcars R51909/13; whilst the following: 'D3' 2123, 'D2' 2181 and 'Dl' 2203 were observed stripped. Locos. awaiting Works or scrapping were: 'Bl' 1091, 'D3' 2139, 'D2' 2170/73, 'J3' 4121 and 'J55' 8319. W.D. No. 77003 was noted in the Erecting Shop. |
SLS/194710 |
17/07/1949 |
Derby Friargate MPD |
On 17/7 the following were noted at the ex G.N.R*. shed here, during the evening:-'D.2' Nos. 62172, 2173/77; 'D.3' No. 2123; 'J.5' Nos. 65484/85, 5497; 'J.6' No.4215; 'J.69' No. 8527. On this date, owing to extensive P.W. repairs on the ex L.M.S. line between Repton and Pear Tree Junction, involving a long section of single line working, certain ex L.M.S. trains from Burton to Derby were diverted via Dove Junction and Egginton over the ex G.N. line to Derby (with ex L.N.E.R. pilotmen from Egginton), passengers being conveyed from Derby (Friargate) to the ex L.M.S. station by omnibus. *The ex G.N. shed at Derby, the entrance to which is in Slack Lane (off Uttoxeter Old Road), is well worth a visit by members visiting the ex L.M.S. Works and Shed at Derby. |
SLS/194909 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1303 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 747 |
|
|
11/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4303 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2123 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 62123 but not taken up |
|
|
12/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2123 from Colwick (CLK) |
|
|