Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1611 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19414 Week
» 72430 Month
» 191957 Year
» 3218810 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3599 |
m/e |
11/1899 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
Metro |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-4-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
119 |
Works Number |
1771 |
To Service |
During 11/1899 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/10/1949 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1899 |
CV.AYN |
|
Abercynon |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/10/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
RYR |
Radyr |
4w/e |
12/07/1947 |
WDN |
RYR |
Radyr |
m/e |
31/10/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1905 |
Diagram S2 boiler fitted (Round top firebox) |
10/1907 |
Diagram S4 boiler fitted (Round top firebox) |
05/1915 |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3599 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1771 |
|
|
04/1905 |
Modification |
Diagram S2 boiler fitted |
|
|
10/1907 |
Modification |
Diagram S4 boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1915 |
Modification |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Abercynon (CV.AYN) |
|
|
17/10/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3599 |
|
|