Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3762 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22673 Week
» 87627 Month
» 290291 Year
» 3317144 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3028 |
|
08/1891 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Dean |
Class |
3021 |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-2-2 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
86 |
Works Number |
1268 |
To Service |
During 08/1891 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1909 |
Service Life |
17 yrs , 6 mths |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
4w/e |
25/01/1947 |
ALLOC |
84B |
Oxley |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
ALLOC |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
m/e |
31/10/1951 |
ALLOC |
84B |
Oxley |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/08/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1891 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3028, name: WELLINGTON Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1268 |
|
|
02/1909 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3028 |
|
|
16/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (84B) |
|
|
31/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|