|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during August included: 992, 1004, 1758, 2023, 2280, 2289, 2409, 2568, 2818, 2833, 2886, 3170, 3375, 3582, 3845, 4015, 4021, 4049, 4055, 4082, 4701, 4800, 4924, 4931, 4945, 4957, 4989, 5006, 5049, 5056, 5069, 5084, 5088, 5094, 5318, 5337, 5347, 5353, 5370, 5913, 5922, 5923, 5940, 5962, 6333, 6909, 6931, an 6965. 2-8-0's which have recently been converted to oil-burning were ex Works as follows: Nos. 4809 (2845) 11/8, 4810 (2853) 13/8, 4857 (3831) 16/8 and 4811 (2847) 20/8. The construction of Lot 366 is under way and No. 6971 (coal-burning) is nearing completion. (16/9). | SLS/194710 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1891 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 2409 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1279 |
||
09/1904 | Modification | Modification: S4 boiler fitted | ||
07/1907 | Modification | Modification: B2 boiler fitted | ||
01/1911 | Modification | Modification: B4 boiler fitted | ||
23/03/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (LLY) | ||
20/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neyland (NEY) | ||
18/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (NEA ) | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Carmarthen (CARM) | ||
04/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Machynlleth (MCH) | ||
23/04/1949 | Allocation | |||
15/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oswestry (89A) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brecon (89B) | ||
22/04/1953 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2409 |